Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:07:31 (UTC).

Oportun Inc vs Luis Perez Montes

Case Summary

On 01/10/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Luis Perez Montes. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Irene. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2499

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Smith, Irene

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Opurtun Inc.

Oportun Inc

Defendant

Perez Montes, Luis Angel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Oportun Inc; Perez Montes, Luis Angel; Comment: Plt. dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Smith, Irene; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less