This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/20/2022 at 21:26:20 (UTC).

Opportunity Fund Community Development vs U.S. Controls, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 Opportunity Fund Community Development filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against U S Controls, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0954

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Opportunity Fund Community Development

Defendants

U.S. Controls, Inc.

Capoccia, Marc

Capoccia, Marc A.

Marc Capoccia

Marc A. Capoccia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Mark W. Good

Good, Mark Wayne

 

Court Documents

Request: Dismissal

11/15/2019 Request: Dismissal

Request: Dismissal

10/23/2019 Request: Dismissal

Minute Order

10/10/2019 Minute Order

Substitution: Attorney

5/15/2019 Substitution: Attorney

Default Entered

4/30/2019 Default Entered

Minute Order

4/25/2019 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

4/9/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/27/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

3/5/2019 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

1/17/2019 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/17/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/17/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Clerk Rejection Letter

1/15/2019 Clerk Rejection Letter

Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

1/7/2019 Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K

Review: Case Status

10/10/2019 Review: Case Status

Review: Case Status

10/10/2019 Review: Case Status

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: entire without prejudice by atty Good

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: partial without prejudice by atty Good as to Does 1-10 only

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Review: Case Status; Department: Department 19; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: Old: Atty Good c/o Terra Law LLP, New: Atty Good c/o Law Office of Mark Good

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Default Entered; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development, U.S. Controls, Inc., Marc Capoccia,; Comment: BASIC E-SERVED 3453394

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development, Marc Capoccia,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development, U.S. Controls, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: FIRST AMENDED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,; Comment: The party names on the Summons and Civil Case Cover Sheet do not match the Complaint. Please re-submit the cover sheet within 10 days of this Notice or you may be subject to sanctions under California Rules of Court, Rule 2.30. envelope #2348060

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Opportunity Fund Community Development,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. CONTROLS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Opportunity Fund Community Development is a litigant