This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:53 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Pedro Rico Olmos

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Pedro Rico Olmos. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Ellis, Terry and Klingsporn, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3554

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Ellis, Terry

Klingsporn, Greg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Rico Olmos, Pedro Ernesto

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Rico Olmos, Pedro Ernesto; Comment: Plt. dismissed without prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Re-Set/Reserve from 06/11/18 by court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Ellis, Terry; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less