This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:46:25 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Miguel Pineda Villanueva

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Miguel Pineda Villanueva. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Yep, Steven L and Steingart, Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3534

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Yep, Steven L

Steingart, Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Pineda Villanueva, Miguel Arturo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Matter is Dismissed Without Prejudice at the request of the plaintiff.); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Pineda Villanueva, Miguel Arturo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued from 05/29/18 by Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Notice of trial continuance.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: AMENDED POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less