This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:51 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Kevin Arenas

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Kevin Arenas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Schatzel, Thomas. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3553

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Schatzel, Thomas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendants

Arenas, Kevin Esau Gerrero

Guerrero-Arenas, Kevin Esau

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Arenas, Kevin Esau Gerrero; Amount; Damages: $643.73; Costs: $85.00; Total: $728.73; Comment: Contract is canceled.; Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Arenas, Kevin Esau Gerrero

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: AMENDED POS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less