This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:48 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Jose Cortes Carrera

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jose Cortes Carrera. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Steves, Bern. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3552

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Steves, Bern

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Cortes Carrera, Jose Manuel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plaintiff filed Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice.); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Cortes Carrera, Jose Manuel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steves, Bern; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fees paid $100.00. - No POS as of 06/04/18.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less