This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:47:39 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Jessica Esquivel

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Jessica Esquivel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Deen, Shella. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3549

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Deen, Shella

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Esquivel, Jessica Ann

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/18/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Deen, Shella; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plaintiff filed a Dismissal Without Prejudice in court); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Esquivel, Jessica Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Deen, Shella; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00. - No POS as of 09/10/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Request: Postponement (Small Claims) (No Fee)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less