This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:46:35 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Eva Perez Valencia

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Eva Perez Valencia. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Yep, Steven L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3538

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Yep, Steven L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Perez Valencia, Eva Candalaria

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Perez Valencia, Eva Candalaria; Amount; Damages: $2,500.00; Costs: $105.00; Total: $2605.00; Comment: Contract is Canceled. DOM: 06/1818.; Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Perez Valencia, Eva Candalaria

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Yep, Steven L; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Fee Paid $100.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • Proof of Service: Personal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Claim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less