This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 15:26:20 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Emiliano Flores

Case Summary

On 02/02/2016 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Emiliano Flores. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Kleinberg, Janet and Colistra, John. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3572

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Kleinberg, Janet

Colistra, John

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progress Financial

1600 Seaport Blvd. Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Oportun Inc.

1600 Seaport Blvd. Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Progreso Financiero

1600 Seaport Blvd. Suite 250

Redwood City, CA 94063

Defendant

Flores, Emiliano Antunez

Milpitas, CA 95035

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Colistra, John; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Flores, Emiliano Antunez; Amount; Damages: $695.68; Costs: $85.00; Total: $780.68; Comment: ***Notice of Entry of Judgment mailed to all parties on 06-30-16.***Contract is Canceled; Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Flores, Emiliano Antunez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Colistra, John; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Continued in Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation Court Appointed Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Kleinberg, Janet; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court-Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Document: Other - Comment: Fictitious Business Name

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2016
  • Cause Of Action - Action Breach of Contract; File Date: 02/02/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant