Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 03:03:19 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Deira Iboa

Case Summary

On 06/14/2016 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Deira Iboa. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steingart, Lisa, Ellis, Terry and Allen, Kenneth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5098

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steingart, Lisa

Ellis, Terry

Allen, Kenneth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progress Financial

Oportun Inc.

Progreso Financiero

Defendant

Iboa, Deira

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Ellis, Terry; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Oportun Inc.; Awarded Against: Iboa, Deira; Amount; Damages: $554.03; Costs: $75.00; Total: $629.03; Comment: contract deemed canceled.; Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Iboa, Deira

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2017
  • Bulk Scanned Documents - Comment: 06-14-16 to 05-19-17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Ellis, Terry; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Cont'd from 2/07/17 by court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Trial Continued by Court. FINAL CONTINUANCE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Document: Other - Comment: Proof of Service by Mail of Continuance Date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Allen, Kenneth; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Continued by Court due to work stoppage: strike in effect.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation Court Appointed Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant