This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:59 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Cesar Rivera

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Cesar Rivera. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Schatzel, Thomas and Klingsporn, Greg. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3561

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Schatzel, Thomas

Klingsporn, Greg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Oportun Inc.

Defendant

Rivera, Cesar Miguel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Judgment Type: Small Claims Dismissal - other (SC); Comment: Comment (No appearance. Dismissed Without Prejudice); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Rivera, Cesar Miguel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Klingsporn, Greg; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Not Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00. Matter ordered reset at 6/12/18 hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Schatzel, Thomas; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12 - Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less