Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/18/2019 at 08:14:01 (UTC).

Oportun Inc. vs Armando Alvarez

Case Summary

On 08/16/2016 Oportun Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Armando Alvarez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Healy, Nicole and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5822

  • Filing Date:

    08/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Healy, Nicole

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Progress Financial

Oportun Inc.

Progreso Financiero

Defendant

Alvarez, Armando

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2017
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Party: Names: Oportun Inc.; Alvarez, Armando; Comment: Request to Dismiss Without Prejudice Filed on 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: Request For Dismissal: Redundant submission; a previous "Request For Dismissal" has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2017
  • Dismissal - Comment: Request to Dismiss Without Prejudice Filed on 06/29/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Healy, Nicole; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Stipulation - Comment: Stipulation: Court Appointed Temporary Judge.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2017
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted - Comment: Amended POS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • Proof of Service: Substituted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Not Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2016
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim-More than 12

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OPORTUN FINANCIAL CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Progress Financial Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where OPORTUN INC. is a litigant