This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:26 (UTC).

Omar Aravza et al vs San Jose Towers LLC

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Omar Aravza filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against San Jose Towers LLC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Borovoy, Roger. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2560

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Borovoy, Roger

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Aravza, Omar

Delancey, Cooper

Defendant

San Jose Towers LLC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Judgment - Non-Monetary Award: Awarded To: San Jose Towers LLC; Awarded Against: Aravza, Omar; Delancey, Cooper; Comment: Defendant does not owe plaintiff any money on plaintiff's claim. Plaintiff takes nothing. Judgment mailed 3/1/18.; Party: Names: Aravza, Omar; Delancey, Cooper; San Jose Towers LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Borovoy, Roger; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Held; Comment: Fees paid $65.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Temporary Judge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: on Certified Mail Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Service by clerk for certified mail, to each defendant - Comment: #70170530000076919126.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less