This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/14/2023 at 01:15:02 (UTC).

Olimpia Meza Pelayo vs Arnulfo Maciel et al

Case Summary

On 01/05/2022 Olimpia Meza Pelayo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Arnulfo Maciel. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******3051

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Olimpia Meza Pelayo

Defendants

Arnulfo Maciel

David and Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUSTAVO MAGANA

Defendant Attorney

Ernest Michael Malaspina

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

11/22/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/22/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/25/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/25/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

11/22/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/8/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

11/7/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Minute Order

6/3/2022 Minute Order

Minute Order

6/2/2022 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/16/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

5/16/2022 Statement: Case Management Conference

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/28/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/8/2022 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/5/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

1/5/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

1/5/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Conference: Further Case Management

11/22/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

11/22/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 16; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Olimpia Meza Pelayo,; Comment: Case management statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arnulfo Maciel, David and Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership,; Comment: HRG: 11/22/2022 - Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Olimpia Meza Pelayo,; Comment: Case management statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Arnulfo Maciel, David and Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership,; Comment: Case Management Statement/POS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Arnulfo Maciel,; Comment: to complaint, atty Malaspina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: David and Esperanza Chavez Family Limited Partnership,; Comment: to complaint, Atty Malaspina

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Olimpia Meza Pelayo,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Olimpia Meza Pelayo,; Comment: Complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Comment: summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less