This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/21/2022 at 13:01:35 (UTC).

Olga Martinez vs Ismael Martin Gonzalez

Case Summary

On 03/10/2021 Olga Martinez filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ismael Martin Gonzalez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0699

  • Filing Date:

    03/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Olga Martinez

Respondent

Ismael Martin Gonzalez

Not Classified By Court

Pretrial Services

Minors

Magdalena Marie Gonzalez

Mailo Gonzalez

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Michael Hector Moreno

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • HearingDescription: Request for Order: Custody/Visitation/Support; Department: Department 78; Time: 1:15PM; Result: Matter Heard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Olga Martinez,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: DV Continuance; Filed By: Olga Martinez,; Comment: With Modified DV-110

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Response: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order; Filed By: Ismael Martin Gonzalez,; Comment: Response: Request for Domestic Violence Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: Ismael Martin Gonzalez,; Comment: Proof of Service: Mail

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Subsequent Request: DVRO w/ Minor; Filed By: Olga Martinez, Ismael Martin Gonzalez,; Comment: (p) all granted, set per judge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Olga Martinez,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less