This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/17/2023 at 04:24:05 (UTC).

OLGA CRUZ vs SWAROOPA BUSSA, MD et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 OLGA CRUZ filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against SWAROOPA BUSSA, MD. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6780

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLGA CRUZ

Defendants

SWAROOPA BUSSA

EDWARD H. LIPTON

MARVIN MASADA

IAN BARRET

GOOD SAMARITAN HOSPITAL

Columbia Good Samaritan Health System Limited Partnership

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason A Pollack

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/4/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/4/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/4/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/4/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/4/2022 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Amendment

6/13/2022 Amendment

Request: Dismissal

7/27/2022 Request: Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: OLGA CRUZ,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amendment; Filed By: OLGA CRUZ,; Comment: Columbia Good Samaritan Health System Limited Partnership as DOE 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: OLGA CRUZ,; Comment: COMPLAINT FOR: 1. MEDICAL MALPRACTICE 2. NEGLIGENCE 3. NEGLIGENT INFLICTION OF EMOTIONAL DISTRESS 4. ASSAULT AND BATTERY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: OLGA CRUZ,; Comment: Summons

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OLGA CRUZ,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less