This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 09:07:59 (UTC).

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION vs STROUSS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2021 OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against STROUSS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2416

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

STROUSS BROTHERS CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tyrone Matthews

 

Court Documents

Summons: Issued/Filed

12/17/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/17/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

12/17/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

1/7/2022 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE CORPORATION,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLD REPUBLIC GENERAL INSURANCE GROUP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MATTHEWS ESQ, TYRONE