This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 03:46:46 (UTC).

O'Connell V. Tibco Software, Inc., Et Al.

Case Summary

On 10/07/2014 O'Connell filed a Contract - Security lawsuit against Tibco Software, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kirwan, Peter. The case status is Other - Consolidated.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1601

  • Filing Date:

    10/07/2014

  • Case Status:

    Other - Consolidated

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Security

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kirwan, Peter

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Mike O'Connell

O'Connell, Mike

Defendants

Vivek Ranadive

Nanci Caldwell

Eric Dunn

Manuel A. Fernandez

Phil Fernandez

Peter Job

David J. West

Philip Wood

Balboa Intermediate Holdings, Llc

Balboa Merger Sub, Inc.

Tibco Software Inc.

Caldwell, Nanci

Ranadive, Vivek

Job, Peter

Fernandez, Manuel A.

West, David J.

Wood, Philip

Fernandez, Phil

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Evan J. Smith

9595 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 900

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Smith, Evan J.

Defendant Attorneys

Steven M Schatz

650 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Schatz, Steven M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Vacated by Court; Comment: Text = Discovery stayed, as of 10/14/14. 1st Amended Complaint filed 10/24/14. CMC vacated; matter consolidated into Lead Case No. 114CV271440 on 11/21/14. Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2015
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: vacated; reset current month; Comment: Text = Discovery stayed, as of 10/14/14. 1st Amended Complaint filed 10/24/14. Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 11/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2014
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Vacated; date advanced; Comment: Text = Motion by the Tibco Defendants to Proceed in One Jurisdiction, to Dismiss or Stay Litigation in the other Jurisdiction, and for the Courts to Confer to Determine an Appropriate Single Forum Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 10/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Hearing: Motion hearings - Original Type: Hearing: Motion hearings; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Text = Motion by the Tibco Defendants to Proceed in One Jurisdiction, to Dismiss or Stay Litigation in the other Jurisdiction, and for the Courts to Confer to Determine an Appropriate Single Forum - granted; stayed pending further order of the Court. Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2014
  • Motion: Consolidate - Original Type: Motion: Consolidate; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Heard: Granted; Comment: Text = Motion by Plaintiff Dhruvin Shah (in Case No. 1-14-CV-271814) to Consolidate Actions (114CV271814, 114CV271440, 114CV271601) and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel - GRANTED Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 11/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-67633 CMC reset from 2/13/15 to 2/27/15 - by the Court Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Continued CMC Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2014
  • Notice - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = appearance of counsel; **EF 67624** Legacy Name = CV Ntc of... Decision = M Closed = 11/17/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Motion: Consolidate - Original Type: Motion: Consolidate; Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: vacated; reset current month; Comment: Text = Motion by Plaintiff Dhruvin Shah (in Case No. 1-14-CV-271814) to Consolidate Actions (114CV271814, 114CV271440, 114CV271601) and Appoint Co-Lead Counsel Result By = C Result Judge = PK - Kirwan, Peter Result Date = 10/30/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Request: Judicial Notice - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Ef G#67600-Rquest for Judicial Notice in support of mtn to Proceed in One Jurisdiction, to Dismiss or Stay Legacy Name = CV Req:Judicial Ntc Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2014
  • Declaration: In Support - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = Ef G#67600-Decl of Catherine Moreno in support of Deft's Reply in support of mtn to Proceed in One Jurisdiction, to Dismiss or Stay Legacy Name = CV Decl in Support Decision = M Closed = 11/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 10/29/2014
  • Motion: Other - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = TIBCO Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Proceed in One Jurisdiction, to Dismiss or Stay Litigation in the Other Jurisdiction, and for the Courts to Confer to Determine an Appropriate, Single Forum 12/5/14 9am D1 Atty Henderson #G-67246 Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Motion/no fee Decision = M Closed = 10/31/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-67160 / taken on ntc of appearance Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Notice: Appearance - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-67160 Legacy Name = CV Ntc of Appearance Decision = M Closed = 10/27/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2014
  • Complaint: Amended - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-67153 (Atty Evan J. Smith) Legacy Name = CV 1st Amended Complaint Decision = M Closed = 10/24/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2014
  • Order: Deeming Case Complex - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = #G-66911 ... and Staying Discovery - signed by Judge Peter H. Kirwan Legacy Name = CV Order Deeming Case Complex Decision = M Closed = 10/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Complex Litigation: Provisional - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Text = 4, 8, 9, 10. Legacy Name = CV Complex Lit/Provisional Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Document: Complex Lit - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complex Fee Payment Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less