This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/22/2022 at 14:56:16 (UTC).

Norma Gamboa-Sandoval vs Amnuay Siripakdi

Case Summary

On 07/12/2019 Norma Gamboa-Sandoval filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Amnuay Siripakdi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1121

  • Filing Date:

    07/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Norma Gamboa-Sandoval

Defendant

Amnuay Siripakdi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allan Alcon Villanueva

Defendant Attorney

Caryn N. Fabian

 

Court Documents

Stipulation and Order

2/27/2020 Stipulation and Order

Request: Dismissal

2/27/2020 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Settlement

2/20/2020 Notice: Settlement

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

10/30/2019 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Minute Order

10/23/2019 Minute Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

10/7/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

9/19/2019 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/12/2019 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/12/2019 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/12/2019 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,; Comment: Stipulation and Order to Retain Jurisdiction CCP 664.6 - signed by Judge Manoukian *see order for details*

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,; Comment: conditional 7-10-20

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Amnuay Siripakdi,; Comment: to Complaint : Atty Fabian

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:00PM; Result: Continued: Court's Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval, Amnuay Siripakdi,; Comment: Joint Case Management Statement

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,; Comment: FIRST AMENDED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Norma Gamboa-Sandoval,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FABIAN, CARYN N.