This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 17:08:39 (UTC).

Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp vs B. Marshall

Case Summary

On 11/22/2010 Nolan, Armstrong Barton, Llp filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against B Marshall. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Steves, Bern, Madden, James P and Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7640

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Steves, Bern

Madden, James P

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp

600 University Ave

Palo Alto, CA 94301

Defendants

Benjamin Marshall

San Jose, CA 95127

Marshall, Benjamin

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Marshall, Benjamin; Party: Name: Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Marshall, Benjamin; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp; Judgment Amount: $2,598.50; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Marshall, Benjamin; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $98.50; Other: $2,500.00; Total: $2598.50; Comment: printdate=Mar 4 2011; origjudgdate=Mar 3 2011; judgstatusdate=Mar 4 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Uncontested (SC); Party: Name: Marshall, Benjamin; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Nolan, Armstrong & Barton, Llp; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = CC2 - Copeland, Christine Result Date = 01/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2015
  • Authorization: Appear on behalf of Party - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Decl:Authority to Represent Decision = M Closed = 01/26/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2014
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = OEX signed and service copy mailed back to creditor 12/9/14 Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2014
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Abstract of Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2014
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steves, Bern; Hearing Time: 8:45 AM; Result: Off Calendar, no appearance; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = BS - Steves, Bern Result Date = 04/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2014
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Produce Statement Closed = 04/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Heard: Default Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 03/03/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2011
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JM - Madden, James Result Date = 01/20/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2010
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 11/22/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2010
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Madden, James P; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 01/21/2011

    Read MoreRead Less