This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 21:15:14 (UTC).

Nicole Y. Castillo and Juan M. Limon

Case Summary

On 06/24/2015 Nicole Y Castillo and Juan M Limon was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weinstein, Joshua. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4842

  • Filing Date:

    06/24/2015

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Weinstein, Joshua

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nicole Y Castillo

San Jose, CA 95129

Petitioner

Castillo, Nicole Y

Defendant

Juan M Limon

Respondent

Limon, Juan M

Minor

Limon, Jenah

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Castillo, Nicole Y; Limon, Juan M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Notice: Default/Uncontested Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2016
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: GRANTED 12/28/15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 11/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Text = petition Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2015
  • Declaration: Income and Expense - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 09/18/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Weinstein, Joshua; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2015

    Read MoreRead Less