This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:50:55 (UTC).

Nicolas Kelpe et al vs Unum Group et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Nicolas Kelpe filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Unum Group. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R, Rudy, Christopher G, Lucas, Patricia M, Zayner, Theodore C and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6094

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Rudy, Christopher G

Lucas, Patricia M

Zayner, Theodore C

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Kelpe, Nicolas C.

Kelp, Nicholas C.

Defendants

Does 1-20, inclusive

Unum Group

TBG West Insurance Services, LLC

Provident Life & Accident Insurance Company

Group, Unum

Interested Party

Howarth III, Frederick W.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Coleman, Terrence Joseph

Defendant Attorneys

Maguire, Daniel William

Zhordania, Theona

Blohm, Nicole Yvette

Zimet, Marc Joseph

Interested Party Attorney

VanDalsem, Bruce Eric

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2019
  • Reserved: Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: MTn for Summary Adjudication by Def. Provident Life & Accident Ins. Co. (Theona Zhordania) Elizabeth 213-455-7643; 6/5/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • Motion: Summary Judgment/Adjudication - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: by Defendant Unum Group (Theona Zhordania)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • Reserved: Discovery - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Motion to Compel by Defendants Provident Life & Accident Ins. Co. and Unum Group (Theona Zhordania) 213-617-4154 (Cynthia) an 4/30/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • Reserved: Summary Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: MTn for Summary Judgment by Def. Unum Group (Theona Zhordania) Gino 213-455-7602; 3/12/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Reserved: Discovery - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: MTN to Compel Further Response and Req. for Prod. of Documents by Unum and Provident Life (Theona Zhordania) 213-617-4154; 4/30/19rb

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • Notice: Association/Co-Counsel - Comment: Association of Attorney/Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Plaintiff to provide further responses for production of documents in the separate statement and Request for Sanctions; by Defendant (Sevan Gobel) *C/F 10/9/18 min.*C/F 11/27/18* C/F 1/29/19*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • Motion: Compel - Judicial Officer: Lucas, Patricia M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Further Responses to the Second Set of Requests for Production of Documents & Document Demands Contained in Deposition Notice by Def Unum Group and Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company (Theona Zhordania)

    Read MoreRead Less
75 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Stipulation - Comment: ADR Stipulation and Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: 7/17/18 - Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Answer to Complaint by Defendants Unum Group, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, and TBG West Insurance Services, LLC. atty: Maguire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Unum Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: TBG West Insurance Services LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Provident Life & Accident Insurance

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less