This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 16:41:58 (UTC).

Nicholas Krishna vs Ruth Lorimer

Case Summary

On 03/24/2017 Nicholas Krishna filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Ruth Lorimer. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hayashi, Roberta S. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1263

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Hayashi, Roberta S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Krishna, Nicholas Raj

Respondent

Lorimer, Ruth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Chen, Andy I

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Hayashi, Roberta S; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Krishna, Nicholas Raj; Lorimer, Ruth

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Comment: 11-14-2018. Granted. Sent to the Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2017
  • Proof of Service: Personal - Comment: income & expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure - Comment: (P)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary) - Comment: (R) mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Fee Waiver Order-Deny - Comment: (R) hrg order re: 1st paper fees of $435.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • Response: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Comment: (r)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chen, Andy I