This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/02/2022 at 06:45:06 (UTC).

Nicholas B. Scheiner and Maren M. Scheiner

Case Summary

On 01/14/2014 Nicholas B Scheiner and Maren M Scheiner was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grilli, Mary Ann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************1792

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Grilli, Mary Ann

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Petitioners

Nicholas B Scheiner

Scheiner, Nicholas B

Defendants and Respondents

Maren M Scheiner

Scheiner, Maren M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Nancy M. Martinez, Esq

2600 El Camino Real, Suite 506

Palo Alto, CA 94306

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2014
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Status; Department: Department 83; Time: 1:45PM; Result: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Withdrawal of Attorney of Record; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Text = w/pos atty martinez Legacy Name = FL Withdrawal of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 05/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Miscellaneous: Converted Document; Comment: Nicholas B. Scheiner and Maren M. Scheiner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Income and Expense; Filed By: Maren Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Income/Expense Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Stip/Waiver:Final Decl of Disclosure Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Default/DS/LS; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Appearance Stipulation & Waiver; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Appear/Stip/Waiver Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2014
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Legal Sep/FC2336; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Legal Sep/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 04/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2014
  • DocketDescription: FC 2336 Packet Received for Review; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SYVL 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 03/28/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Maren Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary); Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Svc of Preliminary Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 03/13/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketDescription: Response: Dissolution; Filed By: Maren Scheiner,; Comment: Text = ls Legacy Name = FL Response DS/NL/LS Decision = M Closed = 02/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2014
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Status Conference; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 02/21/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2014
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service of Summons Filed; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Text = served 1/24/13 in person Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Petition: Dissolution no minor; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage/No minor Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2014
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Residence; Filed By: Nicholas Scheiner,; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 01/14/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martinez, Nancy Maria