Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:42:36 (UTC).

Nichelle Wheelus vs Michael Wyrick

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Nichelle Wheelus filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Michael Wyrick. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Pierce, Mark H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2483

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Wheelus, Nichelle

Defendant

Wyrick, Michael Everett

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cosio, Javier

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2019
  • Hearing: Order to Show Cause - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: FTA/FTS - Plt's FTA may result in dismissal of the case.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Review: Mediation Status - Judicial Officer: Pierce, Mark H; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:45 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: First Amended Summons.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee - Comment: Amended Complaint , Summons issued. atty: Cosio

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • First Paper Filed - Fee - Comment: First paper fee taken on First Amended Complaint. Authorized by atty: Javier Cosio.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Fee Waiver Order-Deny - Comment: denied by Judge Zayner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Fee Waiver Application

    Read MoreRead Less