This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 12:29:44 (UTC).

Ngoc Dung Thi Phan vs Philip Nguyen

Case Summary

On 01/16/2018 Ngoc Dung Thi Phan filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Philip Nguyen. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McGowen, Beth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0165

  • Filing Date:

    01/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McGowen, Beth

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Phan, Ngoc Dung Thi

Respondent

Nguyen, Philip

Minors

Nguyen, Kaitlyn Tram

Nguyen, Brian Duy

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Nguyen, Teresa T.N.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Phan, Ngoc Dung Thi; Nguyen, Philip; Nguyen, Brian Duy; Nguyen, Kaitlyn Tram

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Order: Qualified Domestic Relations - Comment: P-Abbott Stock Riterment Plan (SRP), A 401(k) Retirement Savings Plan-mag

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Settlement Officer Conf - Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Matter Heard; Comment: Specially set. slr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Property - Comment: Separate Property-Petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Appearance Stipulation & Waiver

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Waiver of Final Declaration of Disclosure

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Preliminary)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/10/2018
  • Stipulation and Order Appointment of Pro Tem - No Fee - Comment: Sharon Roper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • Substitution: Attorney

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: Petitioner's Declaration of Shared Residence

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Declaration: Income and Expense

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • Petition Filed

    Read MoreRead Less