This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/29/2022 at 16:45:31 (UTC).

Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC vs H. McClerkin

Case Summary

On 07/09/2009 Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against H McClerkin. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4002

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Newport Capital Recovery Group Ii, Llc

Defendant

Homer D McClerkin

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth John Miele

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/17/2016
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Of satisfaction of judgment. Full satisfaction.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/20/2009
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 11/20/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/26/2009
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = Total Judgment $6945.76 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = costs $265.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC,; Comment: Text = As to Does 1 to 10 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = Re Accrued Interest Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = in support of Atty Fees, interest and costs Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = in support of ownership of claim Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2009
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = in support of default judgment and assignment of account Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 10/26/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/14/2009
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 08/17/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2009
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Newport Capital Recovery Group II, LLC, Homer McClerkin,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 07/09/2009

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEWPORT CAPITAL RECOVERY GROUP II LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MIELE KENNETH J. ESQ.