This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:31 (UTC).

Network Jupiter, Llc vs Bodega Technologies, Llc

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Network Jupiter, Llc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bodega Technologies, Llc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth and Arand, Mary E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6107

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Arand, Mary E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Network Jupiter, Llc

Defendant

Bodega Technologies, Llc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Phon, Lewis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/07/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Comment: re: Default & Default Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Review: Case Status - Original Type: Review: Case Status; Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: re: Default & Jgmt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • Conference: Further Case Management - Judicial Officer: Arand, Mary E; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Proof of Service - Comment: Proof of Service of Case Management Conference Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference - Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Original Type: Conference: Case Management; Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: ***PENDING***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: against: Bodega Technologies, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • Default Pending - Comment: COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less