This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/13/2018 at 09:35:12 (UTC).

Neiva Guzman Valdez and John A. Valdez

Case Summary

On 09/26/2014 Neiva Guzman Valdez and John A Valdez was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2392

  • Filing Date:

    09/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Neiva Guzman Valdez

Morgan Hill, CA 95037

Petitioner

Guzman Valdez, Neiva

Defendant

John Anthony Estevan Valdez

Respondent

Valdez, John Anthony Estevan

Minor

Valdez, Santana Natalie

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - Other Dismissal (CV, FL); Party: Name: Valdez, Santana Natalie; Party: Name: Valdez, John Anthony Estevan; Party: Name: Guzman Valdez, Neiva

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2016
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Fee Waiver -P 09-26-14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = Req:Dismissal,Entire W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 08/28/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Cancelled set for e-review; Comment: Text = set per petition filed 9-26-14 gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 11/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 11/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2014
  • Notice: Cancelled Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Cancelled Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 11/04/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2014
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Order on Court Fee Waiver Decision = M Closed = 10/01/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 09-26-14 to 08-28-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Request to Waive Court Fees (FW-001) - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = Req to Waive Court Fees Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 09/26/2014

    Read MoreRead Less