This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:48:13 (UTC).

Navya Konde vs Madhusudhan Jyothul

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Navya Konde filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Madhusudhan Jyothul. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pegg, Lori E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1269

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pegg, Lori E

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Konde, Navya

Respondent

Jyothul, Madhusudhan Rao

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Pegg, Lori E; Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Names: Konde, Navya; Jyothul, Madhusudhan Rao

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Declaration for default filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2018
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • Returned/Undeliverable Mail - Comment: Req. to Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Request: Enter Default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2018
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: 1st Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Petition: Amended - Comment: 1st Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Petition: Dissolution

    Read MoreRead Less