This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/23/2022 at 04:50:26 (UTC).

National Credit Center, LLC vs Sunnyvale Ford, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 National Credit Center, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Sunnyvale Ford, Inc. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1473

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

National Credit Center, LLC

Defendant

Sunnyvale Ford, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sander Alvarez

Defendant Attorney

Brian Joseph McSweeney

 

Court Documents

Notice of Transfer

12/7/2021 Notice of Transfer

Bulk Scanned Documents

11/15/2021 Bulk Scanned Documents

Bulk Scanned Documents

11/15/2021 Bulk Scanned Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 19; Time: 3:45PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Transfer; Filed By: National Credit Center, LLC, Sunnyvale Ford, Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Transfer In; Comment: From San Diego County. ***ALL FIRST PAPERS PAID***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Bulk Scanned Documents; Comment: MAY 28 2021 to MAY 28 2021. [Complaint]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Bulk Scanned Documents; Comment: MAY 28 2021 to NOV 5 2021. [Stip + Order GRANTING Transfer / Register of Actions]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less