This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 00:05:17 (UTC).

Nathaniel Sobayo vs Attorney Mary Syllivan, Severson & Werson et al

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Nathaniel Sobayo filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Attorney Mary Syllivan, Severson Werson. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mikkelsen, Laurie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0544

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Mikkelsen, Laurie

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Sobayo, Nathaniel Basola

Nathaniel Basola Sobayo

Defendants

American Recovery Company

Ally Financial INC

PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES

Day Break Metro

Attorney Howard Smith, SBN 166574, BERMAN BERMAN BERMAN SCHNIEDER & LOWARY, LLP

Attorney Stephanie Berman Schneider, SBN 68519

Ally Bank

Attorney Mary Syllivan, Severson & Werson

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

9/10/2021 Minute Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/23/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons: Issued/Filed

4/23/2021 Summons: Issued/Filed

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

4/23/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Fee Waiver Order-Grant

4/23/2021 Fee Waiver Order-Grant

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/17/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

2/17/2022 Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear

Certificate

2/16/2022 Certificate

Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action

2/16/2022 Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear; Department: Department 2; Time: 10:00AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice of Bankruptcy Stay - Entire Action; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Certificate; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,; Comment: of Service by Plt Nathaniel Basol Sobayo (In pro per)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,; Comment: Envelope# 8288532 Ex Parte continued OSC Hrg. is require pleadings papers and documents not compliance with Rule 2.100-2.119 and Missing cover sheet on proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 2; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Grant; Filed By: Nathaniel Sobayo,

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Recovery Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where PRIMERITUS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CT CORPORATION SERVICES is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant