This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/12/2022 at 15:15:33 (UTC).

Natalia Gonzalez Magana vs Francisco Ramirez

Case Summary

On 04/13/2018 Natalia Gonzalez Magana filed a Family - Harassment lawsuit against Francisco Ramirez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Overton, Carol. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8082

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Harassment

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gonzalez Magana, Natalia

Natalia Gonzalez Magana

Defendants

Ramirez, Francisco

Francisco Ramirez

Guardian Ad Litems

Gonzalez, Cindy

Cindy Gonzalez

 

Court Documents

Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

5/1/2018 Order: Restraining Order After Hearing

Minute Order

5/1/2018 Minute Order

Proof of Service: Personal

4/30/2018 Proof of Service: Personal

Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

4/19/2018 Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment

Order: Temporary Restraining Order

4/19/2018 Order: Temporary Restraining Order

Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

4/19/2018 Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem

Request: Restraining Order

4/13/2018 Request: Restraining Order

Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/13/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration: In Support

4/13/2018 Declaration: In Support

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Order to Show Cause: RO CH, WV, SV; Department: Department 11; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Heard: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Restraining Order After Hearing; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,; Comment: Granted - Exp 5/1/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Personal; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,; Comment: Clets

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Application and Order: Appoint Guardian ad Litem; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order: Temporary Restraining Order; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,; Comment: Granted

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Hearing TRO Civil Harassment; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,; Comment: re: CV5014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Natalia Gonzalez Magana,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Restraining Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less