This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 03/07/2018 at 17:55:22 (UTC).

N. Ray, et al vs C. Cook

Case Summary

On 01/15/2009 N Ray filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against C Cook. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Saldivar, Gregory H, Steingart, Lisa and Bradley, John F. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2444

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2009

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Saldivar, Gregory H

Steingart, Lisa

Bradley, John F

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Nalani Ray

San Jose, CA 95133

Demarcus Ray

San Jose, CA 95133

Ray, DeMarcus

Ray, Nalani

Defendants

Curtis Cook

San Mateo, CA 94402

Cook, Curtis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ray, DeMarcus; Party: Name: Cook, Curtis; Party: Name: Ray, Nalani

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Bradley, John F; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ray, DeMarcus; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Cook, Curtis; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Ray, Nalani; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Cook, Curtis; Judgment Amount: $1,155.00; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Ray, DeMarcus; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $40.00; Other: $1,115.00; Total: $1155.00; Comment: printdate=Mar 23 2009; freetext=deft does not owe pltf any money on pltf's claim; both parites waive any service issues; origjudgdate=Mar 18 2009; judgstatusdate=Mar 23 2009; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=SCMN;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Judgment Type: Small Claims Judgment - Contested (SC); Party: Name: Ray, DeMarcus; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F; Party: Name: Cook, Curtis; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Ray, Nalani; Comment: dispositiveflag=Yes;foragainstcode=F;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2010
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Steingart, Lisa; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = not served Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 01/04/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2009
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2009
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Off Calendar by court; Comment: Text = not served Result By = C Result Judge = SLY - Yep, Steven Result Date = 11/02/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2009
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2009
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Continued: Court; Comment: Text = not served Result By = C Result Judge = LS - Steingart, Lisa Result Date = 07/27/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2009
  • Hearing: Order of Examination - Original Type: Hearing: Order of Examination; Judicial Officer: Saldivar, Gregory H; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Result: Vacated; Comment: Result By = C Result Date = 05/12/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2009
  • Application: Order of Examination - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Appl/Ord:Appearance/Exam

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2009
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = costs $240.00, credit $0, interest $0 Legacy Name = SC Memo of Costs/after Judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2009
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = santa clara $1170.00 Legacy Name = SC Writ of Exec

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2009
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Original Type: Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant; Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Hearing Time: 1:00 PM; Result: Heard: Judgment; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = JB1 - Bradley, John Result Date = 03/18/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim of defendant Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = 3 pgs Legacy Name = SC Misc Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2009
  • Defendant's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Defendant Claim $1501-$5000 Decision = M Closed = 03/11/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2009
  • Proof of Service - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Legacy Name = SC Proof of Svc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Cause Of Action - Action Complaint; File Date: 01/15/2009

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2009
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,500 or Less - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Comment: Text = claim amount $830.00 Legacy Name = SC Plaintiff Claim $0-$1500 Decision = M Closed = 03/23/2009

    Read MoreRead Less