This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/17/2019 at 14:27:30 (UTC).

N. Mahini vsRD Jet, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/22/2016 N Mahini vsRD Jet, LLC was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are McGowen, Beth, Elfving, William J, Stoelker, James L, Strickland, Elizabeth, Kulkarni, Sunil R and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******0440

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

McGowen, Beth

Elfving, William J

Stoelker, James L

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kulkarni, Sunil R

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mahini, Naz A.

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Prologis, LLC

Restaurant Depot, Inc.

Restaurant Depot

W. G. Fritz Construction, Inc.

RD/JET, LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

W. G. Fritz Construction, Inc.

Restaurant Depot Enterprises, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kepner, Anne J.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Hazelwood, Mark F.

Chin, Kimberly Ying-Yen

Michel, Michael Dean

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Michel, Michael Dean

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Names: Mahini, Naz A.; RD/JET, LLC; Restaurant Depot Enterprises, LLC; W. G. Fritz Construction, Inc.; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Kepner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Name: Comment: Partial X-Comp w/prej ONLY (atty: Friedenthal)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: McGowen, Beth; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Comment: PARTIAL w/prej as to the Complaint ONLY (Anne J. Kepner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Kepner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Comment: envelope # 2778164 - unable to dismiss entire action - Cross Complaints still acive

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Jury Trial: Long Cause - Judicial Officer: Rudy, Christopher G; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: Est. 10 Days

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Motion: In Limine - Comment: HRG 3/4/19 Defendant RD/Jet, LLC dba Restaurant Depot's Motion in Limine No. 12 to Exclude Testimony of Behzad Mahini and Sigurd Meldal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • Notice - Comment: HRG 3/4/19 Defendant RD/Jet, LLC dba Restaurant Depot's Amended List of Original Depositions to be Lodged with the Court

    Read MoreRead Less
129 More Docket Entries
  • 05/17/2016
  • Minute Order - Comment: Minutes Non-Criminal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • Statement: Case Management Conference

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Atty Hazelwood.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2016
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Comment: New firm name: Needham Kepner & Fish LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2016
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less