This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 01:07:29 (UTC).

N. Ahn vs JK Development, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 07/03/2014 N Ahn filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JK Development, Inc . This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Overton, Carol, Stoelker, James L, Folan, Maureen A and Strickland, Elizabeth. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************7489

  • Filing Date:

    07/03/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Overton, Carol

Stoelker, James L

Folan, Maureen A

Strickland, Elizabeth

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Cross Defendants

Namsook Ahn

Kim, Ji Yun

BBQ Town

Yoo, Dong Suk

Christian Business Mission Group, LLC

Citi Mall

JSJ-SC Project, Inc.

Citi Golf

Seoul Jung

Ahn, Namsook

Kang, Hyun Yee

Morning Glory

Jang Su Jang

Lee, Soon

Kang, Kyung Hee

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

Jk Development, Inc.

Ersa Jung

Susan Park

Park, Susan

Jung, Esra

14 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Tae W Oh

2275 E. Bayshore Road, Suite 100

Palo Alto, CA 94303-3222

Lim Ruger & Kim LLP

Bae, Jonathan S.

Lim, John S C

Ezer Law Group

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

Caudill, Thomas

Hann, James C.

Other Attorneys

Hansen, Mark Thomas

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Dismissal - After Court-Ordered Mediation (CV); Party: Name: Yoo, Dong Suk; Party: Name: Yoo, Eugene; Party: Name: Lee, Soon; Party: Name: Kang, Kyung Hee; Party: Name: Lee, Jung Hwan; Party: Name: Morning Glory; Party: Name: JSJ-SC Project, Inc.; Party: Name: Yoo, Dong Suk; Party: Name: Kim, Ji Yun; Party: Name: Kang, Hyun Yee; Party: Name: Christian Business Mission Group, LLC; Party: Name: Park, Susan; Party: Name: Jung, Esra; Party: Name: JK Development, Inc.; Party: Name: Ahn, Namsook

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2015
  • Hearing: Dismissal after settlement - Judicial Officer: Stoelker, James L; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Result By = C Result Judge = MAF - Folan, Maureen Result Date = 10/22/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 11/03/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2015
  • Notice: Entry of Dismissal w/POS - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Ntc:Entry of Dismissal w/POS Decision = M Closed = 10/30/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = as to case 114cv267823 (Mark T. Hansen; Thomas Caudill) Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2015
  • Request: Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Folan, Maureen A; Comment: Text = by attys Hansen & Caudill as to case 114cv267489 Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Entire w/Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 09/12/2014
  • Jury Fee Deposit - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = $150 for jury fees by def Legacy Name = CV Jury Fee Deposit Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Cross-Complaint - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Cross-Complaint Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = Atty James C. Hann Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2014
  • Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = atty caudill Legacy Name = CV Answer, Unltd, w/fees Decision = M Closed = 09/12/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2014
  • Notice: Association/Co-Counsel - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = associates lim Legacy Name = CV Association of Attys Decision = M Closed = 09/10/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2014
  • Substitution: Attorney - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Text = old oh new ruger Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 09/08/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Issued Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 07/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less