Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:16 (UTC).

MONTE BELLO RIDGE, LLC vs ANTHONY GONZALEZ et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 a Property - Residential Eviction case was filed by MONTE BELLO RIDGE, LLC against ANTHONY GONZALEZ in the jurisdiction of Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2246

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Overton, Carol

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTE BELLO RIDGE, LLC

Defendants

ASENCION, CELENIA

GONZALEZ, ANTHONY

Not Yet Classified

All Unnamed Occupants

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/04/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Overton, Carol; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Unlawful Detainer: Awarded To: MONTE BELLO RIDGE, LLC; Entitled to Possession of Premises at: 985 Montebello Drive, Apartment #B205, Gilroy CA 95020; Awarded Against: GONZALEZ, ANTHONY; ASENCION, CELENIA; Party: Names: MONTE BELLO RIDGE, LLC; GONZALEZ, ANTHONY; ASENCION, CELENIA; All Unnamed Occupants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Filed) - Comment: 9/11/18, Santa Clara, Fully Satisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • Writ: Possession (Issued) - Comment: 985 Montebello Drive, Apartment #B205, Gilroy CA 95020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: 985 Montebello Drive, Apartment #B205, Gilroy CA 95020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: against Does I through V only

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: CELENIA ASENCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Default Entered

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • UD Masking Letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Complaint-Unlawful Detainer (Limited): Up to $10K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less