Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/08/2019 at 06:41:06 (UTC).

Mitchell Miller, a PC, dba Miller Law Group, P.C. vs Gerald Pak et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2018 Mitchell Miller, a PC, dba Miller Law Group, P C filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Gerald Pak. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Copeland, Christine. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4997

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Copeland, Christine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mitchell Miller, a PC, dba Miller Law Group, P.C.

Defendants

Pak, Gerald Oul

Hort, Soknea

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Miller, Mitchell Perry

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2018
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Commissioner, Pro Tem; Judgment Type: Dismissal - Request for Dismissal (PR, SC); Comment: Comment (Plaintiff filed Request for Dismissal Without Prejudice); Party: Names: Mitchell Miller, a PC, dba Miller Law Group, P.C.; Pak, Gerald Oul; Hort, Soknea

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Claim: Plaintiff and Defendant - Judicial Officer: Copeland, Christine; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: Fee Paid $50.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2018
  • Request: Dismissal, Entire Action Without Prejudice - Comment: Dismissal without Prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000 - Comment: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim-$1,501 to $5,000

    Read MoreRead Less