This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/13/2022 at 10:25:53 (UTC).

Miriam Turner vs Airline Group Company Limited et al

Case Summary

On 07/09/2018 Miriam Turner filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Airline Group Company Limited. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Pierce, Mark H and Rudy, Christopher G. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1173

  • Filing Date:

    07/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Pierce, Mark H

Rudy, Christopher G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Turner, Miriam

Defendants

Kuwait Airways

Sim, Victor Seow Hong

Gulf Air

Deutsche aka Lufthansa

AirPacific Group

AeroSvit Airlines

Biman Bangladesh Airlines Limited

Thai Airways International Public Company Limited

EgyptAir Airlines

Sim, Jacinta Chio Chhui

El Al Israel Airlines, Ltd

Airline Operations Group Company Limited

Delta Airlines, Inc

British Airways (BA)

KLM Royal Dutch Airlines

Qantas Airways Ltd.

JetStar Airways Pty Ltd

EVA Air Corporation

Victor H. S. Sim, The Revocable Trust of

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Schwartz, Donald Charles

Horowitz, Daniel A.

Russo, Daniel Jason

Defendant Attorney

Whattoff, Randall Craig

Other Attorneys

Daniel Jason Russo

Daniel A. Horowitz

Randall Craig Whattoff

 

Court Documents

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/28/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/28/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

3/28/2019 OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve

Fee Waiver Order-Deny

7/9/2018 Fee Waiver Order-Deny

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/9/2018 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

7/9/2018 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/9/2018 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

7/16/2018 Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable)

Payment: Denied Waiver

7/20/2018 Payment: Denied Waiver

Complaint: Amended

7/24/2018 Complaint: Amended

Minute Order

3/28/2019 Minute Order

Order

4/19/2019 Order

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/4/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Statement: Case Management Conference

9/4/2019 Statement: Case Management Conference

Request: Dismissal

9/18/2019 Request: Dismissal

Notice: Settlement

3/12/2020 Notice: Settlement

Clerk Rejection Letter

4/3/2020 Clerk Rejection Letter

Clerk Rejection Letter

4/22/2021 Clerk Rejection Letter

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: #6298761 - The case was dismissed on 09/18/19. Case number is not listed on document.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Case was dismissed on 09/18/19.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Settlement; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Notice of Settlement of Entire Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: without prejudice by atty Russo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Victor Sim, The Revocable Victor H. S. Sim,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Miriam Turner,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Victor Sim,; Comment: Mtn. to Dismiss

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: OSC: Dismissal Failure to Serve; Department: Department 7; Time: 10:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Motion hearings; Department: Department 2; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint: Amended; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: 1st Amended Complaint - atty Schwartz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Payment: Denied Waiver; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: $435 paid by Atty. Schwartz for Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Advance jury fee (Nonrefundable); Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: $150 jury fee paid for plaintiff Miriam Turner by Atty Schwartz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Order-Deny; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: DENIED by Judge Zayner.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: Fee Waiver Application; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Request to Waive Court Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Miriam Turner,; Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketDescription: Clerk Rejection Letter; Filed By: Victor Sim,; Comment: Stipulation - $435.00 first apperance fee required

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EL AL ISRAEL AIRLINES, LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where Qntas Airways Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where KLM Royal Dutch Airlines is a litigant

Latest cases where Delta Air Lines Inc is a litigant