This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 12/15/2021 at 18:23:27 (UTC).

Mirella Babakhan vs U.S. Bank National Association

Case Summary

On 03/26/2020 Mirella Babakhan filed a Labor - Wrongful Termination lawsuit against U S Bank National Association. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Other - Transferred.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5889

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other - Transferred

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Wrongful Termination

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mirella Babakhan

Defendant

U.S. Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roberto Giulio Ripamonti

Defendant Attorneys

Emilie Consuelo Woodhead

Gabriella R. Albright

Joan B Tucker Fife

 

Court Documents

Minute Order

7/28/2020 Minute Order

Notice

7/16/2020 Notice

Removal to Federal Court

7/16/2020 Removal to Federal Court

Proof of Service: Electronic

7/16/2020 Proof of Service: Electronic

Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/13/2020 Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

6/30/2020 Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

3/26/2020 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Summons: Issued/Filed

3/26/2020 Summons: Issued/Filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Case Management; Department: Department 8; Time: 2:15PM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • DocketDescription: Restored to court's control

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Removal to Federal Court; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association,; Comment: Notice to Adverse Party.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice; Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association,; Comment: Notice to the Clerk of the Superior Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: U.S. Bank National Association,; Comment: Defendant U.S. Bank National Association's Answer to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint ; Atty: Tucker

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Amended Complaint Filed - No Fee; Filed By: Mirella Babakhan,; Comment: FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Mirella Babakhan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Mirella Babakhan,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/26/2020
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less