Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/11/2019 at 06:57:04 (UTC).

Miguel Quiroz vs Thomas Downing

Case Summary

On 07/26/2018 Miguel Quiroz filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Thomas Downing. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Strickland, Elizabeth, Kirwan, Peter and Zayner, Theodore C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******2208

  • Filing Date:

    07/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Strickland, Elizabeth

Kirwan, Peter

Zayner, Theodore C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Quiroz, Miguel

Defendant

Downing, Thomas

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tobin, Philip Morris

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kirwan, Peter; Judgment Type: Dismissal - No ADR (CV); Party: Names: Quiroz, Miguel; Downing, Thomas; Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Tobin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • Hearing: OSC Dismissal Failure to Appear - Judicial Officer: Zayner, Theodore C; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Cancel Reason: Vacated; Comment: and Failure to Serve *No Special or Telephonic Appearance*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: entire with prejudice by atty Tobin

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • Conference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Strickland, Elizabeth; Hearing Time: 3:00 PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies) - Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Comment: Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less