Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/21/2019 at 13:17:38 (UTC).

Midland Funding, LLC vs R. Garcia

Case Summary

On 06/06/2011 Midland Funding, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against R Garcia. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is McCracken, JoAnne. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************6148

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

McCracken, JoAnne

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding, Llc

Defendants

Rosalba Garcia

Garcia, Rosalba

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stelios A. Harris

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd., #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Harris, Stelios A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Garcia, Rosalba; Party: Name: Midland Funding, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Judge, Inactive; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Garcia, Rosalba; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Midland Funding, LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Midland Funding, LLC; Judgment Amount: $4,443.76; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Garcia, Rosalba; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $471.96; Costs: $246.00; Other: $3,725.80; Total: $4443.76; Comment: clerkid=380; printdate=Oct 28 2011; freetext=total judgment $4,443.76; origjudgdate=Oct 28 2011; judgstatusdate=Oct 28 2011; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2012
  • Judgment: Satisfaction - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Acknow/Satisf of Jgmt Full Decision = M Closed = 08/22/2012

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = total judgment $4,443.76 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Declaration: Interest - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = dismiss the doe defts, 1 thru 10, inclusive. Atty Snyder Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2011
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = cost - $246.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 10/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2011
  • Clerk Rejection Letter - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = needs to be a court's judgment Legacy Name = CV Clerk Rejection Ltr Decision = M Closed = 10/11/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2011
  • Notice: Change Address/Firm Name - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = Atty Harris Legacy Name = CV Change of Atty address/Firm Decision = M Closed = 06/28/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2011
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = personal service Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 06/14/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = in support of reduced filing fee Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Text = re venue Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 06/07/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2011
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K - Judicial Officer: McCracken, JoAnne; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Ltd/reduced fee

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS STELIOS A.