This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/07/2019 at 19:51:40 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs Jung Yeon

Case Summary

On 04/04/2018 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Jung Yeon. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******6111

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding LLC

Defendant

Yeon, Jung

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Rudeman, Stasia A.

Rudiman, Stasia A.

Herme, Lisa M

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/30/2019
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Kulkarni, Sunil R; Judgment Type: Default Judgment by Court (CV); Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Midland Funding LLC; Awarded Against: Yeon, Jung; Amount; Damages: $3,713.40; Costs: $245.00; Total: $3958.40; Party: Names: Midland Funding LLC; Yeon, Jung

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • Judgment: Default - Comment: $3958.40 signed by Judge Kulkarni (e-served 07/30/19 #3198831)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Declaration - Comment: RE: Accepting Copies in Lieu of Originals

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Pursuant to CCP 1788.60

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Declaration: CCP 1033

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Declaration: In Support - Comment: Of Interest and Attorneys Fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Request: Dismissal - Comment: Does 1 - 10 ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • Default Entered - Comment: (e-served 07/10/19 #3108889)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • Declaration: Non-Service - Comment: Declaration of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Return of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit - Comment: Re Reduced Filing Fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Affidavit: Venue

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Summons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • Declaration

    Read MoreRead Less