This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/19/2019 at 08:54:50 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs D. Rodriguez

Case Summary

On 01/15/2010 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against D Rodriguez. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Bernardini, Susan and McKenney, Kevin E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************4595

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Bernardini, Susan

McKenney, Kevin E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

Defendants

David Rodriguez

Rodriguez, David

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janalie A. Henriques

151 Bernal Road, Suite 8

San Jose, CA 95119-1306

Henriques, Janalie A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/03/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Rodriguez, David; Party: Name: Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Judge, Inactive; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Rodriguez, David; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Midland Funding LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=YES;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Midland Funding LLC; Judgment Amount: $8,811.42; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Rodriguez, David; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $2,124.32; Costs: $264.00; Other: $6,423.10; Total: $8811.42; Comment: clerkid=319; printdate=Sep 3 2010; freetext=Total Judgment $8,811.42; origjudgdate=Sep 3 2010; judgstatusdate=Sep 3 2010; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Writ: Execution (Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = $12,135.30 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2015
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Cost: $60; credit: $0.66; interest: $3239.54. Atty Lolong. Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 11/23/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Santa Clara; 1/3/14. Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Retn/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 09/01/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2015
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Los Angeles, issued 6/21/13, deficit $11,673.93 Legacy Name = CV Return on Writ fr Sheriff/Unsatis Decision = M Closed = 01/13/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2014
  • Writ: Execution (Issued) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = $10,989.87 Legacy Name = CV Writ of Exec Issued to SCC Decision = M Closed = 01/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2014
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = cost-$60.00, credit-$.66, interest-$2,094.11 mailed 12/12/13 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 01/03/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Writ: Execution (Filed) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = $10,568.02 Los Angeles Legacy Name = CV Writ of Execution Issued Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2013
  • Memorandum of Costs - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Interest: $1731.60 Mailed: 5/17/13 Legacy Name = CV Memo of Costs/After Jgmt Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2010
  • Abstract of Judgment: Issued - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = Total Judgment $8,811.42 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 09/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Declaration: CCP 1033 - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = plus interest calculation and waiver of atty fees Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 09/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2010
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = costs $264.00 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 09/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2010
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Bernardini, Susan; Comment: Text = personal Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 02/03/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 01/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 01/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2010
  • Complaint (Limited): Up to $10K - Judicial Officer: McKenney, Kevin E; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss <$10k Decision = M Closed = 01/15/2010

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HENRIQUES JANALIE