This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/11/2022 at 19:07:28 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs D. Rocchi

Case Summary

On 03/08/2011 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against D Rocchi. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************5898

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

Defendant

Denise Rocchi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Midland Funding, Llc

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd., #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

 

Court Documents

Writ: Execution (Filed)

5/5/2020 Writ: Execution (Filed)

Memorandum of Costs

9/5/2019 Memorandum of Costs

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Filed); Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Partially Satisfied, Issued 9/16/19, Los Angeles County

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Execution (Issued); Filed By: Midland Funding LLC,; Comment: Los Angeles, $31,627.18

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum of Costs; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC,; Comment: Memorandum of Costs

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2014
  • DocketDescription: Substitution: Attorney; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC,; Comment: Text = old atty Rundquist ; new atty Karen Estell Lusis Legacy Name = CV Substitution of Attorney Decision = M Closed = 07/18/2014

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/30/2011
  • DocketDescription: Abstract of Judgment: Issued; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Abstract of Judgment Issued Decision = M Closed = 09/30/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = only as to does 1 to 10. Atty Walsh Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Interest; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Interest Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summary of Case; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summary of Case Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDescription: Memorandum; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = of P&A supporting a clerk judgment Legacy Name = CV Memorandum Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2011
  • DocketDescription: Judgment: Default; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = total judgment $20,719.96 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2011
  • DocketDescription: Request: Enter Default; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = cost - $434.50 Legacy Name = CV Req:Entry of Default Decision = M Closed = 06/24/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil); Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/28/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2011
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: Re: Diligence; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 04/28/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): >$10K and <$25K; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Filed/Summs Iss >$10k Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Affidavit; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Text = of venue Legacy Name = CV Affidavit Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2011
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Midland Funding LLC, Denise Rocchi,; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/08/2011

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant