Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 08/25/2019 at 15:01:28 (UTC).

Midland Funding LLC vs C. Freitas

Case Summary

On 03/20/2014 Midland Funding LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against C Freitas. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fernandez, Alfonso. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************8093

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downtown Superior Court

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judge

Fernandez, Alfonso

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Midland Funding Llc

Defendants

Christian Freitas

Freitas, Christian

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stelios A. Harris

10601-G Tierrasanta Blvd., #4540

San Diego, CA 92124

Harris, Stelios A.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Freitas, Christian; Party: Name: Midland Funding LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Judgment Type: Clerk Default Judgment (CV); Party: Name: Freitas, Christian; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=A; Party: Name: Midland Funding LLC; Comment: dispositiveflag=NO;foragainstcode=F; Judgment - Monetary Award: Awarded To: Midland Funding LLC; Judgment Amount: $1,622.51; And Attorney Fees: $0.00; Awarded Against: Freitas, Christian; Amount; Pre-Judgment Interest: $0.00; Costs: $0.00; Other: $1,622.51; Total: $1622.51; Comment: printdate=Oct 7 2014; freetext=total judgment: $1622.51; possessionflag=0; printpartiesflag=1; origjudgdate=Oct 7 2014; judgstatusdate=Oct 7 2014; judgstatus=Entered; casetype=09LT;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Judgment: Default - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = total judgment: $1622.51 Legacy Name = CV Judgment After Default Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 585 - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP585 Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Declaration: CCP 1033 - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:CCP1033 Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Dismissal - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = as to Does 1-10 only Legacy Name = CV Req:Dismissal, Partial W/O Prej Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2014
  • Default Entered - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Default Entered Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Declaration: Re: Diligence - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Decl:Diligence Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2014
  • Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = subserved Legacy Name = CV Proof of Svc Compl/Pet/Summons Decision = M Closed = 04/11/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Case Cover Sheet Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Summons Filed Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Declaration - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Text = of venue; of reduced filing fee Legacy Name = CV Declaration Decision = M Closed = 03/20/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2014
  • Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K - Judicial Officer: Fernandez, Alfonso; Comment: Legacy Name = CV Complaint Ltd/reduced fee Decision = M Closed = 10/07/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Funding, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARRIS STELIOS A.