This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 14:28:06 (UTC).

Midland Credit Management vs. Merciditas Vergonio

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 Midland Credit Management filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Merciditas Vergonio. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******4072

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Midland Credit Management Inc.

Merciditas Vergonio

Santa Clara, CA 95050

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Mei-Ying Miye Imanaka

Hyo Jin Julia Jung

Thomas Fred Landers

Fred W. Schwinn

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Matthew C Salmonsen

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

4/11/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/11/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Conference: Further Case Management

4/11/2023 Conference: Further Case Management

Minute Order

12/9/2022 Minute Order

Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

12/9/2022 Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Order After Hearing - POS

12/9/2022 Order After Hearing - POS

Notice: Entry of Order

12/9/2022 Notice: Entry of Order

Cross-Complaint

3/7/2022 Cross-Complaint

Writ: Other (Filed)

11/15/2022 Writ: Other (Filed)

Order

11/14/2022 Order

Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

9/9/2022 Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore

Answer (Limited): By Assignee <$5K

3/7/2022 Answer (Limited): By Assignee <$5K

Proof of Service: Electronic

3/7/2022 Proof of Service: Electronic

Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K

2/1/2022 Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K

Summons: Issued/Filed

2/1/2022 Summons: Issued/Filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/1/2022 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Declaration

2/1/2022 Declaration

Declaration

2/1/2022 Declaration

80 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Conference: Further Case Management; Department: Department 10; Time: 10:00AM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: Other; Department: Department 16; Time: 9:00AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Hrg 12-09-22 GRANTED, signed Judge Rosen.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order After Hearing - POS; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: The Court's orders of July 19 2022 and Aug 15 2022 are vacated; Plaintiff's motion to reclassify is DENIED; Plaintiff's alternative motion for relief under CCP 91(c) is DENIED; Plaintiff's motion to strike the cross-complaint is DENIED, signed Judge Rosen.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Merciditas Vergonio,; Comment: Notice of Entry of Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Writ: Other (Filed); Comment: Alternative writ issued by District of Appeal [H050228]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Order; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Notice of Hearing Re Objections to this Court's Compliance with the Writ on Dec. 9, 2022 at 9:00 AM in Dept. 16, signed Judge Rosen.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation and Appointment of Official Reporter Pro Tempore; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Request for Appointment of Offical Reporter Pro Tempore: Reporter: Gina Minnis, Hrg. 8/11/22, 9:00am, Dept. 19.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Notice: Entry of Order; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Notice: Entry of Order - Reclassification Motion

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
69 More Docket Entries
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Answer (Limited): By Assignee <$5K; Filed By: Merciditas Vergonio,; Comment: to Complaint, by Atty. Schwinn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Merciditas Vergonio,; Comment: Proof of Electronic Service

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Cross-Complaint; Filed By: Merciditas Vergonio,; Comment: **Order to Strike Cross-Complaint is SET ASIDE Per Order Filed 12/09/2022** Cross-Complaint for Declaratory Relief and Damages by Atty. Schwinn

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Declaration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Limited): Filed by Assignee <$5K; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Re: Venue

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: Midland Credit Management Inc.,; Comment: Re: Fee

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Midland Credit Management, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer IMANAKA, MEI-YING M.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Landers, Thomas Fred, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Roulston, Raeon Rodrigo