This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 04/30/2021 at 18:11:43 (UTC).

Michelle Santos vs Bohr Bhandal

Case Summary

On 02/22/2021 Michelle Santos filed an Other lawsuit against Bohr Bhandal. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Mikkelsen, Laurie, Ibarra, Audra and Lie, Cynthia C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******8064

  • Filing Date:

    02/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Mikkelsen, Laurie

Ibarra, Audra

Lie, Cynthia C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santos, Michelle

Defendant

Bhandal, Bohr S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Borger, Joshua J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketConference: Case Management - Judicial Officer: Mikkelsen, Laurie; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketHearing: OSC Re Contempt - Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Comment: set per 04/07/21 MO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketHearing: OSC Re Contempt - Judicial Officer: Lie, Cynthia C; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held; Comment: or in the alternative OSC/TRO re:Preliminary Injunction OST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketMinute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) - Comment: Proof of Service of Summons, Complaint and Ex Parte Papers on Bohr Bhandal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketDeclaration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketOpposition/Objections - Comment: **PENDING EX PARTE FILING -4/7/21**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Joshua J. Borger (with Exhibits K-R) in Support of Ex Parte Application re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service re Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time or Specially Set Ex Hearing re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Joshua J. Borger in Support of Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time or Specially Set Ex Hearing re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketApplication - Comment: Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time or Specially Set Ex Hearing re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketProof of Service: Mail - Comment: Proof of Service re Ex Parte Application re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Michelle Santos in Support of Ex Parte Application re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketDeclaration - Comment: Declaration of Joshua J. Borger (with Exhibits A-J) in Support of Ex Parte Application re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketAffidavit - Comment: Memoradum of Points and Authorities in Support of Ex Parte Application re Contempt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketApplication - Comment: Ex Parte Application re Contempt Prelim Injuction hrrg. 04/07/21 @9am in D-12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketComplaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketSummons: Issued/Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Borger, Joshua J