This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/20/2018 at 06:59:37 (UTC).

Michelle Lerma and Raul Lerma

Case Summary

On 10/29/2014 Michelle Lerma and Raul Lerma was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Family Courthouse located in Santa Clara, California. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph, Irwin and Pennypacker, Philip H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ************2422

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Santa Clara County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Family Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

Judge Details

Judges

Joseph, Irwin

Pennypacker, Philip H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michelle Lerma

Gilroy, CA 95020

Petitioner

Lerma, Michelle

Defendant

Raul Lerma

Respondent

Lerma, Raul

Minors

Lerma, Brendon

Lerma, Steven

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/21/2015
  • Diposition: Judgment - Judgment Type: Judgment/order (FL); Party: Name: Lerma, Steven; Party: Name: Lerma, Brendon; Party: Name: Lerma, Raul; Party: Name: Lerma, Michelle

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Miscellaneous: Converted Document - Comment: Michelle Lerma and Raul Lerma

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Judgment: Notice of Entry (Family) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Ntc:Entry of Jgmt/Cert of Mailing Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Judgment: Dissolution/FC2336 - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Jgmt:Dissolution/FL2336 Decl Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2015
  • Declaration: Default/DS/LS - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Default/DS/LS/NL Decision = M Closed = 05/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SthCo 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = G Closed = 05/21/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2015
  • FC 2336 Packet Received for Review - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-SthCo 2336 Packet Received for Review Decision = D Closed = 05/12/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2015
  • Request: Enter Default - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Sth Co Req: Entry of Default Decision = G Closed = 03/16/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2015
  • Conference: Status - Original Type: Conference: Status; Judicial Officer: Assigned, To Be; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM; Result: Cancelled set for e-review; Comment: Text = set per petition filed 10-29-14 gj. Result By = C Result Judge = IJ - Joseph, Irwin Result Date = 11/25/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • Declaration: Service of Disclosure (Final) - Judicial Officer: Pennypacker, Philip H; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Service of Final Decl/Discl Decision = M Closed = 02/19/2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2014
  • Proof of Service of Summons Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Proof of Svc/Summons Decision = M Closed = 12/16/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2014
  • Notice: Cancelled Status Conference - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL-Ntc:Cancelled Status Conference Decision = M Closed = 11/22/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Bulk Scanned Documents-Conversion Case - Comment: Bulk Scan 10-29-14 to 05-21-15

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Declaration: Residence - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl of Residence Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Declaration: Under UCCJEA - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Decl:Uniform Custody Act Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Summons: Issued/Filed - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Summons Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2014
  • Petition: Dissolution w/minor - Judicial Officer: Joseph, Irwin; Comment: Legacy Name = FL Petn:Dissol of Marriage w/Minor Decision = M Closed = 10/29/2014

    Read MoreRead Less