This case was last updated from Santa Clara County Superior Courts on 02/22/2022 at 10:07:58 (UTC).

Michael Stevenson vs PNC Bank et al

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Michael Stevenson filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against PNC Bank. This case was filed in Santa Clara County Superior Courts, Downtown Superior Court located in Santa Clara, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******5096

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Santa Clara, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Stevenson

Defendants

PNC Bank

The Wolf Firm

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Timothy George McFarlin

Defendant Attorney

Melissa Robbins Coutts

 

Court Documents

Conference: Further Case Management

5/31/2022 Conference: Further Case Management

Civil Case Cover Sheet

7/1/2021 Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

7/1/2021 Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies)

Ex Parte Application

11/4/2021 Ex Parte Application

Proof of Service: Electronic

11/4/2021 Proof of Service: Electronic

Request: Judicial Notice

11/5/2021 Request: Judicial Notice

Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

11/8/2021 Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil)

Order: Ex Parte

11/10/2021 Order: Ex Parte

Stipulation and Order

12/7/2021 Stipulation and Order

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • HearingDescription: Hearing: OSC TRO/Preliminary Injunction; Department: Department 12; Time: 1:30PM; Result: Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Minute Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Dismissal; Comment: Request for Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Declaration Party ISO Automatic Extension.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: PNC Bank,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Request: Judicial Notice; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Declaration of Melissa Coutts In Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Declaration of Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. in Support of Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Mail; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Opposition/Objections; Filed By: PNC Bank,; Comment: Opposition to Plaintiff's Application for Preliminary Injunction

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Proof of Service: Electronic; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Ex Parte Application; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: for Temporary Restraining Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: OF MICHAEL STEVENSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Declaration: In Support; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: OF LETICIA RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Acknowledgement/Receipt; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: Notice & Acknowledgment of Receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Statement: Case Management Conference; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: Case Management Statement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: New Filed Case

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Complaint (Unlimited) (Fee Applies); Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: Complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDescription: Summons: Issued/Filed; Filed By: Michael Stevenson,; Comment: Summons

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE WOLF FIRM is a litigant

Latest cases where PNC Bank, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer COUNTS MELISSA ROBBINS ESQ.